Financial history THE CARELINE APPEAL FUND

Charity number: 1050433
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.32k £4.09k £3.31k £18.05k £8.66k
Total expenditure £4.93k £7.49k £6.31k £7.36k £11.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A