Financial history FRANK KINGSLAND'S TRUST FOR THE ELDERLY

Charity number: 1050883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.03k £10.51k £12.31k £12.89k £19.01k
Total expenditure £6.78k £20.62k £5.38k £6.04k £6.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A