Financial history THE PLEASANCE THEATRE TRUST

Charity Number: 1050944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £3.76m £945.88k £1.49m £4.06m £4.50m
Total expenditure £3.76m £1.24m £1.46m £4.16m £4.49m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £456.37k £54.29k £4.00k £2.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £149.08k £740.98k £1.04m £370.49k £230.45k
Income - Other trading activities £45.66k £64.04k £136.84k £385.49k £434.88k
Income - Charitable activities £3.50m £121.58k £274.04k £3.25m £3.73m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £18.46k £19.27k £118 £8.87k £59.22k
Income - Other £39.25k £0 £33.41k £39.38k £44.31k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.71m £2.53k £1.30m £3.87m £4.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £1.10m £14.37k £14.35k £18.07k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £9.50k £9.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £41.16k £136.04k £145.97k £272.68k £292.45k