Financial history THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF MIDRASH SHMUEL

Charity number: 1050989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £146.49k £109.91k £88.63k £214.84k £215.59k
Total expenditure £93.34k £29.09k £77.23k £184.00k £303.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A