Financial history ESSEX RESPITE & CARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1051589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £187.11k £228.28k £215.57k £281.78k £350.23k
Total expenditure £195.93k £203.85k £238.11k £277.17k £284.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.78k N/A £75 N/A