Financial history MITFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1051752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £28.37k £16.62k £14.45k £6.98k £11.24k
Total expenditure £24.75k £6.17k £8.24k £4.72k £15.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.80k £14.30k £10.67k N/A £6.48k