Financial history SCOPE IN COLCHESTER AND TENDRING

Charity number: 1051946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £97.57k £152.27k £110.27k £122.07k £140.33k
Total expenditure £132.33k £137.73k £126.42k £132.09k £131.30k
Income from government contracts £61.27k N/A N/A N/A £84.55k
Income from government grants N/A £92.02k N/A N/A N/A