Financial history Church Ablaze

Charity number: 1051958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.45k £15.28k £20.40k £18.03k £34.97k
Total expenditure £17.91k £16.89k £11.44k £29.31k £32.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A