THE MAIDSTONE MEDIATION AND REPARATION SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer mediation services for neighbours, victim and offenders, parents and teenagers, anger management and peer mediation in schools. All these in the Maidstone Council area and part of the Tonbridge & Malling Council area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,000 from 2 government contract(s) and £12,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 23 January 1996: Standard registration
- MAIDSTONE MEDIATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE ENGLISH CLLR | Chair | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY WILLCOX Treasurer | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Stringer | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Francis Ann Kemp | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Vizzard | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.12k | £50.47k | £77.47k | £45.10k | £44.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.28k | £83.42k | £81.94k | £62.85k | £61.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £11.60k | N/A | N/A | £10.36k | £12.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.49k | £33.58k | £21.07k | N/A | £12.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 12TH DECEMBER 1995 AND AMENDED 21 OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND FOR THE BETTER PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC ORDER THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS MEDIATION, CONCILIATION OR REPARATION BETWEEN PERSONS, ORGANISATIONS OR GROUPS WHO ARE INVOLVED IN DISPUTES ARISING FROM CRIMINAL ACTIVITY OR INTER-PERSONAL CONFLICT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community Support Centre
Marsham Street
Maidstone
ME14 1HH
- Phone:
- 01622692843
- Email:
- maidstonemediation@gmail.com
- Website:
-
maidstonemediation.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window