THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS' AND WISLEY CHURCHES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust makes grants towards the upkeep, repair, maintenance and improvement of St Nicholas Church, Pyrford, and Wisley Church, both in Surrey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 11 March 1996: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF ST. NICHOLAS CHURCH PYRFORD (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nicholas Paul Hutchinson BA PGCE | Chair | 28 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew Farley Pearce BA | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Hewitt FCA | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROGER HOLT BSc | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAJOR DAVID RONALD POLLARD BA | Trustee | 01 April 2005 |
|
|||||
ELDON EWING SANDYS MA | Trustee | 12 March 2003 |
|
|
||||
Dr IAN VALENTINE HOWELL MA DPhil | Trustee | 01 April 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.71k | £159.81k | £8.48k | £19.48k | £14.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.75k | £6.08k | £28.96k | £8.68k | £10.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20/12/1995 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26/11/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16 NOV 2017 as amended on 09 Oct 2023as amended on 09 Oct 2023as amended on 10 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
For the public benefit for the upkeep, repair, maintenance and improvement of the fabric, contents and equipment of: St Nicholas' Church Pyrford, its closed and open (active) churchyards, adjoining car parks and the Old School Room; and also for Wisley Church and its churchyard.
Area of benefit
PYRFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o The Parish Office
Church Of The Good Shepherd
Coldharbour Road
Pyrford
Woking
GU22 8SP
- Phone:
- 01932 346345
- Email:
- admin@wisleywithpyrford.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window