THE FRIENDS OF ST JAMES' CHURCH NAYLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of St. James' Church exists to support the repair, maintanance and improvement, of this lovely Church, by way of grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 03 February 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALLAN WILLIAM MACHIN | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cameron Duncan | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN PEARSON | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
KATHY HUNT | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PARTRIDGE | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.32k | £3.89k | £9.23k | £7.65k | £8.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £1.99k | £10.64k | £3.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 February 2023 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 3 NOVEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED 12TH MARCH 1999 AND 6 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
1.TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE PRESERVE, IMPROVE AND RECONSTRUCT THE FABRIC OF ST JAMES' CHURCH NAYLAND, INCLUDING ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURES, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS, OTHER CHATTELS AND ITS CHURCHYARD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. 2. TO ADVANCE THE WORK OF THE CHURCH IN THE PARISH OF ST JAMES' NAYLAND BY SUPPORTING THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NAYLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 BIRCH STREET
NAYLAND
COLCHESTER
CO6 4JA
- Phone:
- 01206262800
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window