MARANATHA COMMUNITY CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular church activities. Support of UK based foreign missions. Financial aid overseas as and when needed eg. disaster funds etc through UK based organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 08 February 1996: Standard registration
- 16 May 2024: Removed (Excepted charity)
- KIDZONE (Previous name)
- MARANATHA BREAKTHROUGH (Previous name)
- MARANATHA FULL GOSPEL CHURCH (Previous name)
- THE STARLIGHT COMMUNITY PROJECT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.42k | £6.97k | £7.27k | £11.28k | £8.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.52k | £6.89k | £7.87k | £7.22k | £9.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 May 2024 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 MAY 1995
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SCARBOROUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window