Accounts and annual returns BURWARTON AND CLEOBURY NORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1053039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 November 2023 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 March 2022 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 November 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required