PURLEY AND COULSDON CLUBS FOR THE ELDERLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PACE aims to enable older people to meet with others for stimulation, entertainment, social events, outings, interests and friendship. In addition, the clubs provide a gate-way to health or other services by advice on other locally available help and assistance. A freshly cooked hot meal at an affordable price is also available as part of the overall services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 19 February 1996: Standard registration
- P A C E (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward McGrath | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Gordon Blake | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER BLAKE | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|||||
CYNTHIA ROACH | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|||||
SHEILA JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN JAMES COATES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.24k | £35.25k | £72.96k | £52.28k | £31.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.50k | £36.38k | £38.64k | £50.37k | £46.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.00k | £29.96k | £29.97k | £29.99k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 173 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 May 2023 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 May 2023 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 May 2023 | 459 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 May 2023 | 459 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 NOVEMBER 1995 AMENDED 15 DECEMBER 1995 AND 20TH MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF OLDER PEOPLE WITHIN THE ELECTORAL WARDS OF COULSDON EAST AND WEST WOODCOTE PURLEY AND KENLEY AND ADJOINING AREAS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES WHICH MEET THEIR SOCIAL HEALTH AND EDUCATIONAL NEEDS SUCH AS LUNCHEON CARE AND RECREATIONAL PROGRAMMES
Area of benefit
EAST AND WEST WOODCOTE PURLEY AND KENLEY AND ADJOINING AREAS IN LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
119 LANSDOWNE ROAD
PURLEY
CR8 2PE
- Phone:
- 02086682270
- Email:
- Pace119@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window