Trustees RYEDALE Y M C A

Charity number: 1053352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Sue Hawes Chair 13 March 2019
None on record
Farroway Raegild Dantalion Trustee 04 March 2025
None on record
Lynne Cole Trustee 04 June 2024
None on record
Karen Amanda Taylor Trustee 12 April 2023
None on record
Sarah Jean Wintringham Trustee 24 March 2023
None on record
Lucy Jennings Trustee 18 September 2019
None on record