Financial history ROYAL BROMPTON AND HAREFIELD HOSPITALS CHARITY

Charity number: 1053584
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.05m £9.35m £7.28m £8.68m £10.44m
Total expenditure £7.80m £9.80m £7.42m £8.09m £9.65m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.58m £6.01m £3.70m £3.99m £4.74m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £28.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.44m £3.34m £3.58m £4.69m £5.70m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £309.00k £437.00k £801.00k £1.54m £1.69m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.00m £6.72m £4.65m £3.25m £4.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.56m £2.15m £1.97m £3.56m £3.75m
Expenditure - Governance £98.00k £64.00k £23.00k £36.00k £39.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.40m £6.00m £3.71m £3.05m £3.68m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.32m £1.25m £991.00k £2.44m £2.21m
Expenditure - Other £1.25m £930.00k £805.00k £1.28m £1.75m