FELTON AND THIRSTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We enjoy social and educational meetings and offer friendship to any women in the villages, particularly those new to the area. We provide a visible presence, helping in the local community and also operating a small walking group open to any local women. We fundraise for local charities and take responsibility for making the villages more visually attractive by planting tubs + containers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Northumberland
Governance
- 11 March 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maureen Anne Thomas | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Althea Margaret Sowter | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Margaret Krzyzosiak | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Smith | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jackson | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Beddow | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.32k | £426 | £2.35k | £3.30k | £1.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £821 | £912 | £1.43k | £2.83k | £1.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Gables
West Thirston
MORPETH
Northumberland
NE65 9EG
- Phone:
- 01670787527
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
feltonandthirstonw.wixsite.com/website
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window