Financial history NORWICH DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION OF RINGERS

Charity number: 1053715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £10.93k £1.04k £5.28k £9.56k £11.57k
Total expenditure £7.18k £2.15k £9.25k £6.99k £13.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A