Financial history OCKENDEN INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1053720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £79.52k £80.03k £76.11k £129.73k £326.76k
Total expenditure £356.70k £242.01k £222.71k £203.23k £217.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A