Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF HOWDEN TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1053783
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £23.59k £26.81k £105.48k £62.36k £73.73k
Total expenditure £25.04k £16.23k £44.19k £45.98k £48.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A