Financial history GIRLS FRIENDLY SOCIETY IN ENGLAND AND WALES

Charity number: 1054310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £518.46k £274.05k £228.59k £312.83k £350.39k
Total expenditure £737.40k £760.66k £951.81k £1.06m £1.08m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.22k
Income - Donations and legacies £27.87k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.97k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £481.26k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £7.35k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £3.41k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £639.82k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £97.57k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £34.76k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £28.95k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A