Trustees GLOUCESTERSHIRE GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS
Charity number: 1054403

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Anthony Tebble | Chair | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Harrison | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Coughlan | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Ockwell | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aron Richard Mockford | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan McClung | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Smith | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Pepper | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bowden | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.