Financial history THE FIRST STEP LTD

Charity number: 1054533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £606.94k £712.75k £882.18k £1.10m £1.52m
Total expenditure £600.66k £700.54k £855.44k £998.41k £1.30m
Income from government contracts £169.77k £169.74k £181.62k £185.08k £185.08k
Income from government grants £291.65k £213.58k £324.71k £479.37k £515.93k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.91k £4.67k £11.27k £9.38k £7.24k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £604.00k £708.08k £870.92k £1.09m £1.51m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.60k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £600.66k £700.54k £855.44k £998.41k £1.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.40k £2.40k £2.42k £0 £6.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0