Trustees FRITHWOOD SURGERY PATIENTS PARTICIPATION GROUP

Charity number: 1054582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jean Anne Batten Chair 02 April 2025
None on record
Dr TIM CROUCH Trustee 02 April 2025
None on record
Jennifer Taylor Trustee 21 February 2024
FRITH YOUTH CENTRE, BUSSAGE
Received: On time
David Malcolm Scott Trustee 13 November 2023
None on record
Janet Daphne Cadman Trustee 31 July 2023
None on record
Mary Elizabeth Brooks Trustee 20 July 2022
None on record
Susan Bradley Trustee 20 July 2022
None on record
Jane Gregg Trustee 02 August 2018
OAKRIDGE VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Received: On time
Harry Joyce Trustee 14 September 2015
None on record
Dr William Nattrass Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record