Accounts and annual returns ADOPTION SUPPORT

Charity number: 1055000
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 23 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 23 September 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 17 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 17 December 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 27 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 18 December 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 21 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 12 November 2008 On Time