CHRISTIAN RELIEF UGANDA

Charity number: 1055166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Christian Relief Uganda (CRU) was established in 1996 to support the pioneering work of missionary Maria Maw MBE in helping children and families in the underprivileged district of Kamuli in the Busoga Region of Uganda. Today CRU funding provides:- Education at all levels, Help to needy families and individuals, and sponsorship schemes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £82,246
Total expenditure: £74,862

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Animals
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 May 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CRU (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Parker Chair 02 February 2016
THE MARANATHA COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
Meriel Carboni Trustee 17 June 2024
None on record
Charles Thomas Parker Trustee 04 September 2022
None on record
Rhona Lesley Marshall Mrs Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Helen Whitehead Trustee 31 January 2020
None on record
Roslyn Smith Trustee 21 February 2017
None on record
Kim Harwood Trustee 17 January 2017
None on record
Paul Roebuck Trustee 20 August 2012
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAWRENCE, BIDDULPH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £94.07k £73.58k £69.72k £65.49k £82.25k
Total expenditure £93.55k £72.30k £70.41k £64.83k £74.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
566 Kings Road
Stretford
Manchester
M32 8JT
Phone:
07732556381