Financial history WHITBY CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1055396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.14k £2.43k £3.28k £3.66k £2.50k
Total expenditure £1.53k £2.06k £2.31k £2.05k £2.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A