THE WREKIN BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve (1) donations, subscriptions and covenants for and on behalf Masonic charities established within the United Grand Lodge of England and (2) donations for and on behalf of any registered charity or individuals nominated by the Wrekin Lodge No. 2883.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Shropshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 May 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William James Murray | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony James Jenkins | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW NICHOLAS DUDLEY SYMON | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
KELVIN MALCOLM STEAD | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PHILIP PRICE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25k | £1.12k | £1.67k | £1.19k | £2.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £494 | £1.10k | £523 | £560 | £4.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 March 2023 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
TO RELEIVE (1) SUBSCRIPTIONS AND COVENANTS FOR AND AND ON BEHALF OF THE MASONIC TRUST FOR BOYS AND GIRLS THE NEW MASONIC SAMARITAN FUND AND THE ROYAL MASONIC BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION AND (2) DONATIONS FOR AND ON BEHALF OF ANY REGISTERED CHARITY NOMINATED BY THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGH WALLS
THE STREET
WEST WINTERSLOW
SALISBURY
SP5 1RY
- Phone:
- 07973625281
- Email:
- DAVIDSTOTT227@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window