Financial history M E WHYTE BEQUEST

Charity number: 1055614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £9.75k £9.72k £8.63k £20.30k £2.96k
Total expenditure £8.43k £4.96k £3.83k £57.98k £5.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A