UXBRIDGE LOCAL HISTORY AND ARCHIVES SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monthly talks from September to May are followed by a series of Summer outings to places of historic interest. Our magazine, "The Uxbridge Record", appears twice a year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 11 June 1996: Standard registration
- UXBRIDGE LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas John Schofield | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MR A J MITCHELL | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Harrison | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.97k | £53 | £1.17k | £1.37k | £1.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.03k | £290 | £1.31k | £16.60k | £1.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED NOVEMBER 1971 (AS AMENDED ON 23RD APRIL 1996)
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN HISTORY ,AND IN PARTICULAR THE HISTORY OF THE AREA COVERED BY THE FORMER BOROUGH OF UXBRIDGE.
Area of benefit
UXBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Presbytery
Osborne Road
UXBRIDGE
Middlesex
UB8 1UE
- Phone:
- 01895230060
- Email:
- njschofield@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window