Trustees CAMBRIDGE AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity number: 1056102

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Corrin Frances Hoyes | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julian Jacobs | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carol Anne Boston | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Heather Le Mercier Du Quesnay CBE | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Charles Cook | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Anthony Lister French | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Catherine Elizabeth Canning | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Eve Whitfield | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Joseph Powell | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Kayum Arain | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|||||
ASHLEIGH HOWARD BRIDGES | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.