Trustees KENTISBEARE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1056237

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Elaine Bliss-Howe | Chair | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beth Philpot | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
ASHLEY WALTER PERSEY | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew William Chave | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh Chave | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexis Ephgrave | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Lacey | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jane Kissock | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Fiona Cantrill | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Josephine Hawkins | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Reed | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Collier | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Stidworthy | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Frier | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.