Financial history THE WHITTINGTON HOSPITAL NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUNDS

Charity number: 1056452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £356.42k £857.60k £493.42k £429.00k £551.00k
Total expenditure £514.62k £774.73k £1.03m £417.00k £768.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £709.98k N/A N/A £198.00k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £670 N/A N/A £23.00k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £118.60k N/A N/A £286.00k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £28.35k N/A N/A £44.00k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A £61.61k N/A N/A £18.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £723.09k N/A N/A £531.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £51.64k N/A N/A £198.00k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £27.66k N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A £9.00k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £39.00k