Financial history KINGSTON HOSPITAL NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1056510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.16m £1.83m £2.42m £2.27m £2.12m
Total expenditure £1.40m £2.08m £2.30m £1.65m £2.94m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £895.00k £1.45m £1.28m £1.95m £1.70m
Income - Other trading activities £186.00k £319.42k £257.11k £165.00k £139.48k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £82.00k £60.75k £58.74k £151.00k £252.61k
Income - Other £0 £0 £818.08k £0 £24.44k
Income - Legacies £384.00k £483.28k £304.01k £967.00k £104.43k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.18m £1.85m £2.08m £1.36m £2.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £218.00k £224.36k £221.16k £285.00k £247.62k
Expenditure - Governance £54.00k £67.21k £75.46k £79.00k £87.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.13m £1.79m £2.00m £1.28m £2.60m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0