Financial history CARETAKERS TRUST

Charity number: 1056749
Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.29k £11.23k £11.20k £11.98k £13.28k
Total expenditure £2.30k £10.57k £15.47k £10.70k £10.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A