Financial history INVOLVE NORTHWEST

Charity number: 1056777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.97m £2.39m £3.18m £3.55m £2.86m
Total expenditure £1.94m £2.13m £2.81m £3.27m £2.99m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.65m £2.05m £2.84m £2.74m £2.43m
Income - Donations and legacies £15.36k £11.05k £12.01k £13.39k £24.35k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.92m £2.35m £3.11m £3.47m £2.72m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £40.81k £33.74k £52.12k £69.22k £114.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.94m £2.13m £2.81m £3.27m £2.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.10k £10.02k £10.80k £24.14k £36.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0