Financial history DARTS,DONCASTER COMMUNITY ARTS

Charity number: 1056799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.08m £757.91k £801.81k £803.91k £997.83k
Total expenditure £1.08m £757.96k £832.55k £855.29k £978.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £13.43k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £190.14k £218.44k £234.58k £524.12k £604.97k
Income - Donations and legacies £7.33k £1.18k £7.88k £1.21k £8.97k
Income - Other trading activities £107.18k £36.82k £48.09k £56.94k £89.35k
Income - Charitable activities £963.47k £714.61k £742.23k £731.90k £869.85k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.07k £5.31k £3.61k £13.86k £29.66k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.01m £708.94k £788.29k £800.04k £896.51k
Expenditure - Raising funds £69.90k £49.02k £44.26k £55.24k £82.35k
Expenditure - Governance £10.04k £5.38k £7.88k £4.31k £6.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0