Trustees THE GARSTANG AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity number: 1056868

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Holden | Trustee | 25 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Janet Ann Simpson | Trustee | 25 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Pamela Miller | Trustee | 25 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Briggs | Trustee | 25 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Hewitt | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Scott Winstanley | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Rothwell | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Harry Edward Salisbury | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Atkinson | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Smith | Trustee | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Gibson | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sally Hull | Trustee | 16 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Hull | Trustee | 16 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP HALHEAD | Trustee | 23 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARK GORST | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.