Financial history WALLINGTON CHRISTIAN OUTREACH LIMITED

Charity number: 1056875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £123.80k £98.03k £127.77k £139.55k £181.20k
Total expenditure £120.82k £108.79k £131.79k £149.78k £175.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £641 N/A N/A N/A