Accounts and annual returns THORNTON CLEVELEYS ROUND TABLE AND 41 CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1057031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 April 2024 21 March 2025 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 02 April 2023 28 February 2025 392 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 02 April 2022 13 March 2023 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 02 April 2021 18 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 02 April 2020 12 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2020 Not Required