Accounts and annual returns EUROPEAN PARTNERS IN CHRIST

Charity number: 1057592
Charity reporting is up to date (271 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 26 February 2025 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 26 February 2025 271 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 08 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 08 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 03 July 2022 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 03 July 2022 33 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 30 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 13 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 13 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window