THE OTTOMAN COMMUNITY AND HERITAGE FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the history, culture, art of the Ottomans and of related cultures
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 August 1996: Standard registration
- OTTOMAN FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Onol Mehmet Karakasli | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hussain Aounullah Khan | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharif Hussain Khan | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
MUSTAFA KEMAL MEYZIN | Trustee | 29 July 1996 |
|
|
||||
SHAHID AHMAD KHAN | Trustee | 29 July 1996 |
|
|
||||
CANER HELVACIOGLU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £995 | £1.29k | £10.47k | £8.82k | £14.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £910 | £1.02k | £3.10k | £5.25k | £10.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29TH JULY 1996
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HERITAGE AND CIVILISATION INCLUDING THE LANGUAGES, ARCHITECTURE, HISTORY, ART AND CRAFTS OF THE OTTOMANS (2)THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY (3)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (4)THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO ARE VICTIMS OF NATURAL AND MAN-MADE DISASTERS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, BY THE PROVISION OF MONEY AND SUCH EMERGENCY SUPPLIES AND EQUIPMENT AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GODBYS FARM
CRICKLADE
SWINDON
SN6 6HT
- Phone:
- 07939030806
- Email:
- sk@khanadamson.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window