Financial history MILTON KEYNES AND DISTRICT REFORM SYNAGOGUE

Charity number: 1058193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £47.42k £43.51k £43.64k £52.10k £60.77k
Total expenditure £39.91k £32.04k £28.11k £46.60k £54.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A