Trustees MILTON KEYNES AND DISTRICT REFORM SYNAGOGUE
Charity number: 1058193

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louanndreas Tribus | Chair | 02 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Jane Pachter | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Gordon | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Ernest Pachter | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROMA SARAH MAIA FRIEDMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Neville MBE | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Pruskin | Trustee | 14 June 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.