Financial history KLINEFELTER'S SYNDROME ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1058319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £25.00k £11.78k £18.85k £24.51k £35.91k
Total expenditure £19.82k £6.50k £14.13k £21.62k £20.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A