Financial history SANDY SPORTS AND LEISURE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1058457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.74k £11.25k £93.00k £14.85k £16.40k
Total expenditure £289 £3.79k £202.69k £2.09k £1.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £80.00k N/A N/A