Governing document THE BRIDGEWATER HALL COMMUNITY EDUCATION TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26/09/1996 AS AMENDED ON 18/09/1997 AS AMENDED ON 21/07/2003 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/2007 AS AMENDED ON 05/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING, SUPPORTING, ASSISTING AND CO-ORDINATING EDUCATIONAL AND ARTISTIC PROJECTS AND EVENTS IN THE COUNTY OF GREATER MANCHESTER AND ITS ENVIRONS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO ACTIVITIES RELATED TO OR CONNECTED WITH THE BRIDGEWATER HALL MANCHESTER. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 3 OF TRUST DEED)
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.