Financial history JIMMY'S CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1058737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.80m £2.46m £2.32m £2.23m £2.29m
Total expenditure £1.74m £1.59m £1.89m £2.31m £2.48m
Income from government contracts £606.78k £77.80k £1.39m £486.72k £2.08k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £65.00k £10.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £520.34k £1.20m £898.26k £706.10k £677.14k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.28m £1.25m £1.42m £1.52m £1.61m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.22k £2.45k £3.55k £1.38k £1.98k
Income - Other £0 £11.81k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £122.31k £93.74k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.74m £1.57m £1.87m £2.30m £2.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £18.66k £19.51k £16.85k £21.51k
Expenditure - Governance £2.54k £0 £0 £0 £13.26k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0