Trustees JIMMY'S CAMBRIDGE
Charity number: 1058737

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Baldwin | Chair | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Ian Cardwell | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Smart | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Paterson | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence James White | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elwin Yam Ming Chan | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Wiles | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alok Rustagi | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aidan Joseph Lonergan | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Holt | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Sherwin | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.