2ND EVESHAM BENGEWORTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1058798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

scouting

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £15,390
Total expenditure: £15,192

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 October 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Trevor Albutt Trustee 15 January 2025
None on record
Kirsty Day Trustee 15 January 2025
None on record
Simon Cooper Trustee 06 November 2024
None on record
Lara Etherton Trustee 06 November 2024
None on record
Andrew Moore Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
keith anthony norledge Trustee 12 July 2018
None on record
Joe Kelleher Trustee 03 November 2016
None on record
BOB IAN BAILEY Trustee
THE ALBRIGHT WOOD NORTON ESTATE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
PETER JOHN LIPPETT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.35k £25.18k £23.47k £13.87k £15.39k
Total expenditure £23.22k £12.33k £15.11k £15.90k £15.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.53k £3.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 May 2024 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 February 2022 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SPARROWS NEST
WOOD NORTON
EVESHAM
WR11 4TE
Phone:
01386860261
Website:

No information available